Search
Ask a question
0

what are the steps for example 59*53

what are the steps

Comments

Are you asking how to multiply 59 times 53?


I just want to be sure of the question before I give you a possibly confusing answer.

2 Answers by Expert Tutors

Tutors, sign in to answer this question.
Maurice S. | Skilled, effective tutoring the way YOU learn!Skilled, effective tutoring the way YOU ...
4.9 4.9 (606 lesson ratings) (606)
1

While Robert's answer is correct, it will only work for multiplying by numbers that end in 9.  A more general answer is:

One can look at this as (50 + 9) * (50 + 3)

So one has to multiply 50 * 50, 50 * 3, 9 * 50, and 9 * 3, and then add them all together.

So 2500 + 150 + 450 + 27 = 3127

The standard way of doing this is as follows:

                                      5 9

                                  *  5 3

                                 1  7  7      multiply 59 * 3

                          + 2  9  5  0      multiply 59 * 50

                             3  1  2  7      add the two lines above

Robert J. | Certified High School AP Calculus and Physics TeacherCertified High School AP Calculus and Ph...
4.6 4.6 (13 lesson ratings) (13)
0

59*53

= (60-1)*53

= 60*53 - 53

= 3180 - 53

= 3127