Arthur D. answered • 09/13/14

Effective Mathematics Tutor

use trial and error

here are some numbers I came up with...

875*96=84,000 875-96=779

965*87=83,955 965-87=878

975*86=83,850 975-86=889

976*85=82,960 976-85=891

985*76=74,860 985-76=909

it appears that the smaller the difference between the numbers, the greater the product, up to a point and then the products start to get smaller

for example, 578*69=39,882 and 578-69=509 but you want much larger numbers, numbers in the 800s and 900s

and the other number in the 80s or 90s